Refine your search

6 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/20/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-435.
12/20/2006 Signed by President.
12/19/2006 Presented to President.
12/09/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/8/2006 S11821-11822)
12/08/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9160-9179)
12/07/2006 Introduced in House