Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/17/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/17/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/16/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/24/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/07/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/20/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/23/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/06/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/14/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/15/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/27/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/19/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/23/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/28/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/28/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/28/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/15/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/15/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/15/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/15/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew