Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/08/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/16/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/05/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/13/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/28/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/04/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/11/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/25/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/08/2006