Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/01/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/11/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/25/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/25/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/15/2006