Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/05/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/19/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/25/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/13/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/17/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/15/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/15/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/01/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/08/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/14/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/22/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/05/2006