Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/10/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/10/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/16/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/19/2005