Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/09/2005