Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/09/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/09/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/14/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/06/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/20/2005