Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/17/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/05/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/16/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/18/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/28/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/19/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/10/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/16/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/16/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/16/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 11/18/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/18/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/18/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/18/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/07/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006