Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/09/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/14/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/14/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/20/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/20/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/28/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/16/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/07/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/07/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/24/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/22/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/07/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/06/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/06/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/01/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/03/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/14/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/01/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/28/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/27/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/11/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/16/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/29/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/12/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/13/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/13/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/08/2006