Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/10/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/13/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/14/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/09/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/29/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/29/2005