Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/09/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/13/2005