Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/16/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/12/2005