Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/10/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/18/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/18/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/18/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew