There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Self-Employment Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to conduct a pilot project on the use of educational assistance under programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs to defray training costs associated with the purchase of certain franchise enterprises.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/07/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1772-1774)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2005Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/04/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/17/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/17/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E496)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2005Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2005Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2005Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E218-219)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/10/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/04/2005 Referred to
05/25/2005 Hearings by
House Armed Services02/10/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/17/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.745.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.745. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/2005)

Veterans Self-Employment Act of 2005 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to conduct a five-year pilot project to test the feasibility and advisability of the use of educational assistance under certain programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs to pay for training costs associated with the purchase of a franchise enterprise. Prohibits the use of such assistance unless: (1) training is required and provided in connection with the purchase and operation of a franchise; and (2) such training, and the training entity, are approved by the Secretary. Provides training and entity approval requirements.