Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2006