Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/06/2006