Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/12/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/03/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/18/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/11/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/14/2006