Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/15/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/15/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/12/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/19/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/19/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2005