Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/15/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/15/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/16/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/21/2005