There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Rocky Mountain National Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Rocky Mountain National Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adjust the boundary of Rocky Mountain National Park in the State of Colorado.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/08/2005Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-108.
02/10/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/08/2005Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2005Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-108.
05/18/2005Subcommittee on National Parks Discharged.
05/18/2005Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/18/2005Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/12/2005Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands
03/02/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
02/10/2005Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/17/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources02/10/2005 Referred to
05/18/2005 Markup by
06/08/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-108
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands03/02/2005 Referred to
05/12/2005 Hearings by
05/18/2005 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.774. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (06/08/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Rocky Mountain National Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to accept an offer to convey specified Federal land near MacGregor Ranch, Larimer County, Colorado, in exchange for specified non-Federal land located near the Ranch.

Instructs the Secretary to: (1) reserve an easement to the Federal land for the purposes of protecting, preserving, and enhancing the conservation values of that land; and (2) adjust the boundary of Rocky Mountain National Park, Colorado, to reflect the acquisition of the non-Federal land and manage such land as part of the Park.