Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/07/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/22/2005