Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/10/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/10/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/16/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/16/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/16/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/02/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/10/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/21/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/07/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/18/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/12/2006