Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/14/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2006