Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/15/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/16/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2006