Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/16/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/09/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/09/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/16/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/12/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/12/2006