There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Colorado River Indian Reservation Boundary Correction Act

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Colorado River Reservation Boundary Correction Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Colorado River Indian Reservation Boundary Correction Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Colorado River Indian Reservation Boundary Correction Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Colorado River Indian Reservation Boundary Correction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To correct the south boundary of the Colorado River Indian Reservation in Arizona, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/02/2005Became Public Law No: 109-47. (TXT | PDF)
08/02/2005Signed by President.
07/27/2005Presented to President.
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/2005Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9055-9056)
04/12/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1865-1866)
02/14/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005Became Public Law No: 109-47. (TXT | PDF)
08/02/2005Signed by President.
07/27/2005HousePresented to President.
07/26/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/2005SenateSenate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9055-9056)
04/13/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
04/12/2005-2:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/12/2005-2:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1865-1866)
04/12/2005-2:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 794.
04/12/2005-2:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1865-1867)
04/12/2005-2:44pmHouseMr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/14/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
02/14/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/14/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources02/14/2005 Referred to
Senate Indian Affairs04/13/2005 Referred to
07/26/2005 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.794.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.794. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-47 (08/02/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Colorado River Indian Reservation Boundary Correction Act - Declares that the boundaries of the Colorado River Indian Reservation are the boundaries delineated by the Robbins Survey of 1875 and affirmed by the Harrington Resurvey of 1912 (which include 16,000 acres known as the La Paz lands).

Restores to the Reservation all right, title, and interest of the United States to those lands within such boundaries that were excluded from the Reservation pursuant to Executive Order No. 2273 (November 22, 1915), which shall be held in trust by the United States on behalf of the Colorado River Indian Tribes. (Excludes from such restored lands specified Arizona State Lands.)

Declares that land taken into trust under this Act shall neither be considered to have been taken into trust for gaming nor be used for gaming.