There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Transportation to work with the State of New York to ensure that a segment of Interstate Route 86 in the vicinity of Corning, New York, is designated as the "Amo Houghton Bypass".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/15/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2005Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/16/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/16/2005
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/16/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/16/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/16/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/16/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/16/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/08/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2005 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines02/15/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.795. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2005)

Designates the segment of Interstate Route 86 between its interchange with New York State Route 15 in the vicinity of Painted Post, New York, and its interchange with New York State Route 352 in the vicinity of Corning, New York, as the "Amo Houghton Bypass."