Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/16/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/16/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/16/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/16/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/16/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/16/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/16/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/08/2005