Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/15/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/02/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/13/2005