Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/02/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/02/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/03/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/03/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/03/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/03/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/10/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/14/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/14/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/14/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/20/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/20/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/20/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/20/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/20/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/20/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/20/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/20/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/20/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/20/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/12/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/12/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/12/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/13/2005