Text: H.R.8 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (04/20/2005)

 
[Congressional Bills 109th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 8 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]






                                                        Calendar No. 84
109th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                 H. R. 8


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             April 14, 2005

                                Received

                             April 19, 2005

                          Read the first time

                             April 20, 2005

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
            To make the repeal of the estate tax permanent.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Death Tax Repeal Permanency Act of 
2005''.

SEC. 2. ESTATE TAX REPEAL MADE PERMANENT.

    Section 901 of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation 
Act of 2001 shall not apply to title V of such Act.

            Passed the House of Representatives April 13, 2005.

            Attest:

                                                 JEFF TRANDAHL,

                                                                 Clerk.
                                                        Calendar No. 84

109th CONGRESS

  1st Session

                                H. R. 8

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT

            To make the repeal of the estate tax permanent.

_______________________________________________________________________

                             April 20, 2005

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar