Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/15/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/16/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/01/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/01/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/01/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/01/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/03/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/09/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/15/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/13/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/13/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/19/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/19/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/26/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/26/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/26/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/03/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/03/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/03/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/03/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/17/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/26/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/16/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/27/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/14/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/04/2006