Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/30/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/27/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/28/2006