Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/16/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/14/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/18/2006