Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/09/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/26/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/12/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/18/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/18/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/20/2005