Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/10/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/10/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/16/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/18/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/22/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/20/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/05/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/07/2006