Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2005