Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/19/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/31/2006