Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/22/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/18/2005