Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/03/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/03/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/05/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/30/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/19/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/07/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/28/2006