Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/23/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/23/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/03/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew