Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/28/2006