Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/04/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/09/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/07/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/14/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/23/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/17/2005