Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/01/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/24/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/25/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/08/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/08/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/09/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/09/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/09/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/24/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2005