Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/06/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/13/2006