Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/08/2005