Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/19/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/26/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/16/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/20/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/20/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/22/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/09/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/09/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/14/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/21/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/26/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/27/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/28/2006