Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/01/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/13/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/03/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/28/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/08/2005