Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/10/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/25/2006